Wang et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Plaintiff: Jen Chiang Lai and Yu Wang
Defendant: Kevin Cuccinelli, David Pekoske, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS") and Sarah Kendall
Case Number: 1:2019cv06249
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Hughes on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Hughes, Jeanne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Sarah Kendall, David Pekoske. (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued) (Guzzi, Roseann)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #9 Motion to Adjourn. Initial Status Conference adjourned to 1/14/2020 at 5:00 PM in Chambers 704S. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/18/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Jen Chiang Lai, Yu Wang. (Pennacchio, Valerie)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Jen Chiang Lai, Yu Wang (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #2 Proposed Summons Sarah H. Kendall, #3 Proposed Summons David P. Pekoske) (Pennacchio, Valerie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kevin Cuccinelli, David Pekoske, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"). (Attachments: #1 summons issued, #2 summons issued, #3 summons issued, #4 summons issued) (Guzzi, Roseann)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Jen Chiang Lai, Yu Wang (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Cuccinelli, #2 Proposed Summons Donoghue, #3 Proposed Summons U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security, #4 Proposed Summons Pekoske, #5 Proposed Summons USCIS) (Pennacchio, Valerie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter requesting issuance of summonses by Jen Chiang Lai, Yu Wang (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pennacchio, Valerie)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan for an Initial Status Conference on 12/23/2019 at 10:45am in Chambers 704S. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to notify all attorneys in this action of the conference schedule in writing. No later than 24 hours prior to the Initial Status Conference, the Government must file a brief letter advising the Court whether the status of the case has changed since the filing of the complaint. Counsel is directed to review Judge Cogan's Individual Practices, which may be obtained on the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/content/judge-brian-m-cogan. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Cogan's Rules. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/7/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yu Wang, Jen Chiang Lai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Pennacchio, Valerie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12014393 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Yu Wang, Jen Chiang Lai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pennacchio, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jen Chiang Lai
Represented By: Valerie G Pennacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Wang
Represented By: Valerie G Pennacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cuccinelli
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pekoske
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS")
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kendall
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?