Serpas v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Faviola Serpas
Defendant: Metro North, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Metropolitan Transportation Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv06263
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Kronrad on behalf of Faviola Serpas (notification declined or already on case) (Kronrad, Jessica)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 6, 2019 The case of Serpas v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 19cv6263. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-09825. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York. (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer the case file to the Eastern District of New York and shall close the case on the docket of this Court. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/30/2019) (ama) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Huma Ali on behalf of Metro North, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Ali, Huma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Kronrad on behalf of Faviola Serpas. (Kronrad, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sophia Ree. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Metro North. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme, County of Queens. Case Number: 717156/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17827649).Document filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Metro-North Railroad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Verified Complaint)(Ree, Sophia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ree, Sophia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serpas v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro North
Represented By: Huma Ali
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Huma Ali
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Authority
Represented By: Huma Ali
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faviola Serpas
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Kronrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?