Davidson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Levi Davidson
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06274
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff having voluntarily dismissed two of the three defendants, and having advised the Court that he has settled with the third, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are filed within this period. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/18/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Levi Davidson with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Kroub, Edward)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement with Bank of America, N.A. by Levi Davidson (Kroub, Edward)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Levi Davidson with Barclays Bank Delaware (Kroub, Edward)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Magnusson, Steven)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Magnusson, Steven)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven William Magnusson on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Magnusson, Steven)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 . Defendant Bank of America, N.A. can have until 1/6/2020 to answer, but the Initial Status Conference, and its previously posted requirements, shall proceed as scheduled for 12/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/4/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Massand, Shan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Levi Davidson. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 12/23/2019 at 11:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/12/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Levi Davidson. Barclays Bank Delaware waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Kroub, Edward)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bank Of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12017996 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Levi Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven William Magnusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Davidson
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?