Rivera v. Mac Donut Corp.
Plaintiff: Edin Rivera
Defendant: Steve Mandel and Mac Donut Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06434
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 2/24/2020 @ 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/11/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 1/24/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/11/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Mac Donut Corp.. (Deker, Maayan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Maayan Deker on behalf of Mac Donut Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Deker, Maayan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Ng on behalf of Mac Donut Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Ng, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Steve Mandel. (Guzzi, Roseann)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Edin Rivera (Garbarini, Richard)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edin Rivera. Mac Donut Corp. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Garbarini, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mac Donut Corp.. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Edin Rivera (Garbarini, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Edin Rivera (Garbarini, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mac Donut Corp., Steve Mandel filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-12063889 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Edin Rivera. (Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Mac Donut Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edin Rivera
Represented By: Richard M. Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Donut Corp.
Represented By: Maayan Deker
Represented By: William H Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?