74 Pinehurst LLC et al v. State Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Dino Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 74 Pinehurst LLC, 141 Wadsworth LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias and Dimos Panagoulias
Defendant: Sheila Garcia, J. Scott Walsh, City of New York, May Yu, State Of New York, Leah Goodridge, David Reiss, Cecilia Joza, Alex Schwartz, RuthAnne Visnauskas, New York City Rent Guidelines Board, German Tejeda, New York Division of Housing and Community Renewal and Patti Stone
Intervenor: Community Voices Heard (CVH), Coalition For the Homeless and N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)
Case Number: 1:2019cv06447
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivano Michael Ventresca on behalf of 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias (notification declined or already on case) (Ventresca, Ivano)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/8/2020. (LK)
December 13, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Berg on behalf of New York Division of Housing and Community Renewal, State Of New York, RuthAnne Visnauskas (aty to be noticed) (Berg, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Mosier on behalf of 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias (notification declined or already on case) (Mosier, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/12/2019. (LK)
December 11, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12145301. by 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ivano Ventresca, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ventresca, Ivano)
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12144132. by 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 KS Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing) (Mosier, Mark)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Motion to Intervene. The Court grants the letter motion to intervene. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/10/2019. (Williams, Tenisha)
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Joan Halligan on behalf of Coalition For the Homeless, Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) (aty to be noticed) (Halligan, Caitlin)
December 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Baldwin on behalf of Coalition For the Homeless, Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) (notification declined or already on case) (Baldwin, Sean)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 Letter MOTION to Intervene by N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N), Community Voices Heard (CVH), Coalition For the Homeless. (Baldwin, Sean)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Parties' Jointly Proposed Briefing Schedule for Contemplated Motions to Dismiss. The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule for defendants and intervenors' motions to dismiss. Defendants and intervenors shall file their motions to dismiss on or before February 14, 2020; plaintiffs shall file their opposition on or before March 6, 2020; and defendants and intervenors shall file their replies, if any, on or before March 27, 2020. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/9/2019. (Williams, Tenisha)
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 Letter re: Parties' Jointly Proposed Briefing Schedule for Contemplated Motions to Dismiss by 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias (Sperling, Jonathan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin King on behalf of 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias (notification declined or already on case) (King, Kevin)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/5/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12120144. by 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 MD Certificate of Good Standing) (King, Kevin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. RuthAnne Visnauskas served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. German Tejeda served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. David Reiss served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. Patti Stone served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. Leah Goodridge served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. J. Scott Walsh served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. Cecilia Joza served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. Alex Schwartz served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. May Yu served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. New York Division of Housing and Community Renewal served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. State Of New York served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. City of New York served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. New York City Rent Guidelines Board served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. Sheila Garcia served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Joachim, Jordan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. Joachim on behalf of 141 Wadsworth LLC, 177 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, Dimos Panagoulias, Dino Panagoulias, Vasiliki Panagoulias (aty to be noticed) (Joachim, Jordan)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Judge William F. Kuntz, II, Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/21/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12065803 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation, 141 Wadsworth LLC, 74 Pinehurst LLC, Vasiliki Panagoulias, 177 Wadsworth LLC, Dino Panagoulias, Dimos Panagoulias. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons) (Sperling, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 74 Pinehurst LLC et al v. State Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Scott Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of New York
Represented By: Michael A. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Goodridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Joza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RuthAnne Visnauskas
Represented By: Michael A. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Rent Guidelines Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German Tejeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Division of Housing and Community Renewal
Represented By: Michael A. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Panagoulias
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Jordan S. Joachim
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 177 Wadsworth LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Jordan S. Joachim
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Jordan S. Joachim
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 74 Pinehurst LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Jordan S. Joachim
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 141 Wadsworth LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Jordan S. Joachim
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasiliki Panagoulias
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Jordan S. Joachim
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimos Panagoulias
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Jordan S. Joachim
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Community Voices Heard (CVH)
Represented By: Sean Baldwin
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Coalition For the Homeless
Represented By: Sean Baldwin
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)
Represented By: Sean Baldwin
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?