Hossain v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nur Hossain
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06452
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are filed within this period. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/22/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Nur Hossain (Geller, Edward)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/19/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Beth Silverman on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Silverman, Ellen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Midland Credit Management, Inc. from Civil Court of the City of New York, County of Kings, case number CV-009777-19. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12066882) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Briganti, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hossain v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nur Hossain
Represented By: Edward B. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Brett Briganti
Represented By: Ellen Beth Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?