Charach v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aharon Charach
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, Chase Bank USA, N. A., TransUnion, LLC. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06595
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Clovis, Esther)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 AM on 2/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 2/19/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/3/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #18 is granted. Attorney Russel Craig Weinrib is hereby withdrawn from the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/26/2019. (Guo, Alicia)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #17 is granted. Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 1/15/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/26/2019. (Guo, Alicia)
December 24, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aharon Charach. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Force, David)
December 24, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aharon Charach. TransUnion, LLC. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Force, David)
December 24, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aharon Charach. Chase Bank USA, N. A. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 1/25/2020. (Force, David)
December 24, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION to Withdraw Attorney by Aharon Charach. (Force, David) Modified on 12/26/2019 (Guo, Alicia).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 is granted. Defendant Chase Bank USA, N. A. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 1/25/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/23/2019. (Guo, Alicia)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, until January 15, 2020 by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Clovis, Esther)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Danielle Clovis on behalf of Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Clovis, Esther)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC.. (Nicodemus, Camille)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #14 is granted. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 1/27/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/23/2019. (Guo, Alicia)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on consent of Plaintiff, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Jones, Stephanie)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/19/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 Letter Requesting Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint with Consent of Plaintiff by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Jones, Stephanie)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Jones, Stephanie)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Haltiner Jones on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Jones, Stephanie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Letter Requesting Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint with Consent of Plaintiff by Chase Bank USA, N. A. (Turcotte, Christopher) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Guo, Alicia).
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Turcotte on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N. A. (aty to be noticed) (Turcotte, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aharon Charach. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Weinrib, Russel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aharon Charach. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Weinrib, Russel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC.. (Nicodemus, Camille)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC. (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 25, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-12089966 (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chase Bank USA, N. A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, TransUnion, LLC. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Aharon Charach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charach v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Haltiner Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Represented By: Esther Danielle Clovis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N. A.
Represented By: Christopher B. Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC.
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aharon Charach
Represented By: Russel Craig Weinrib
Represented By: David Paul Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?