Chen v. Bowes
Petitioner: Yu Hsuan Chen
Respondent: Lee F. Bowes
Case Number: 1:2019cv06608
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of Lee F. Bowes (aty to be noticed) (Dickman, Mary)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yu Hsuan Chen. Lee F. Bowes served on 11/29/2019, answer due 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS Online Proof of Delivery on U.S. Attorney Office EDNY) (Yerman, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lee F. Bowes, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Naturalization Hearing In The Nature Of Mandamus filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12093659, filed by Yu Hsuan Chen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit) (Yerman, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yu Hsuan Chen
Represented By: Gary J. Yerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lee F. Bowes
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?