Ecico Group Limited v. Foxiedox,LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ecico Group Limited
Defendant: Foxiedox,LLC, Stephanie In Callahan and Su Yong Paek
Case Number: 1:2019cv06665
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Rey, Julissa)
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim : Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims of Defendant, Foxiedox LLC by Ecico Group Limited. (Kadish, Allen)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion to Request Mediation; granting #19 Motion to Adjourn Conference sine die; granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Case Management Plan; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Selection of Mediator due by 2/4/2020.) Mediation shall be completed by 3/20/2020. The parties are directed to file a status report within fourteen (14) days after mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/21/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to Request Mediation , MOTION to Adjourn Conference : Letter to Judge Reyes Requesting (i) Approval of the Proposed Case Management Plan; (ii) Assignment to the Courts Mediation Panel; (iii) Adjournment of the Initial Case Conference and (iv) Adjournment of Dates and Deadlines in the Proposed Case Management Plan. by Ecico Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Plan) (Leney, Douglas). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document on 1/17/2020 (Vertus, Miriam).
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas G Leney on behalf of Ecico Group Limited (notification declined or already on case) (Leney, Douglas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION #15 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Ordered by Clerk of Court on 1/17/2020. (Marziliano, August)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Douglas G. Leney Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/16/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Motion to Admit Douglas G. Leney Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12261991. by Ecico Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Leney, Douglas)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Ecico Group Limited. (Kadish, Allen)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 1/24/2020. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/30/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foxiedox,LLC (Sewell, Steven)
December 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Sewell, Steven)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ecico Group Limited. Stephanie In Callahan served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Kadish, Allen)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ecico Group Limited. Su Yong Paek served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Kadish, Allen)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ecico Group Limited. Foxiedox,LLC served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Kadish, Allen)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Su Yong Paek. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Stephanie In Callahan, Foxiedox,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stephanie summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Ecico Group Limited (Kadish, Allen)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Ecico Group Limited (Kadish, Allen)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Ecico Group Limited (Kadish, Allen)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephanie In Callahan, Foxiedox,LLC, Su Yong Paek filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-12103581 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Ecico Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Debt Rescheduling Deed, dated May 30, 2019, #2 Exhibit B Debt Rescheduling Deed, dated June 12, 2019, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Default, dated November 12, 2019) (Kadish, Allen) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/26/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecico Group Limited v. Foxiedox,LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxiedox,LLC
Represented By: Steven H Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie In Callahan
Represented By: Steven H Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Su Yong Paek
Represented By: Steven H Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecico Group Limited
Represented By: Allen G. Kadish
Represented By: Douglas G Leney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?