Lefkowitz v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yisroel Lefkowitz
Defendant: Alphabet Inc. and Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06739
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for defendants to answer the complaint is extended to February 17, 2020. The Initial Conference is rescheduled for February 19, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/13/2020. (Cornelssen, Cornelius)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint and to Adjourn the Initial Conference Scheduled for Jan. 23, 2020 by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Fleming, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on January 23, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that defendants are aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for All Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 16, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/4/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Fleming, Michael) Modified on 12/4/2019 to reflect the correct type of motion. (Riquelme, Claudia).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/3/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google LLC re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Fleming, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC. (Fleming, Michael)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal by Google LLC (Fleming, Michael)
November 29, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal Declaration of Anna Bril by Google LLC (Fleming, Michael)
November 29, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal Declaration of Stephanie Schuster by Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Fleming, Michael)
November 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Google LLC from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 523387/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12111801) (Fleming, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefkowitz v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yisroel Lefkowitz
Represented By: Joseph Y Balisok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?