Brown v. County of Kings et al
Plaintiff: Torrey Brown
Defendant: County of Kings, Chelsea Toder, CPT Banks J., Fries, Brown, Inv. Timothy and Eric Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2019cv06755
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. ( (Original Letter along with the attached copy of the Prisoner Authorization form sent to Torrey Brown # 18-A-3220 at Elmira Correctional FacilityP.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14902 by Pro Se department) (Almonte, Giselle)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (Original Letter along with the attached copy of the Prisoner Authorization form sent to Torrey Brown, # 18-A-3220 at Downstate Correctional Facility, P.O. Box F, Fishkill, NY 12524 - via first class mail.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Letter dated 12/19/19 from Lisa M. Barse to Clerk of the Court, re: legal mail and informing the Court that offender Torrey Brown is temporarily absent from Upstate Correctional Facility; and may not return in the immediate future. (Galeano, Sonia)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dated 12/3/19 from Pro Se Dept. to Torrey Brown, plaintiff pro se regarding deficiency. Attached prisoner authorization. (Guzzi, Roseann)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-10723. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 26, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Order, to Torrey Brown 18-A-3220 Elmira Correctional Facility P.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14902. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 25, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/25/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 19, 2019 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #1 by Torrey Brown. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Torrey Brown.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Torrey Brown.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Brown, County of Kings, Fries, Eric Gonzalez, Banks J., Inv. Timothy, Chelsea Toder. Document filed by Torrey Brown.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Torrey Brown.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. County of Kings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Toder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT Banks J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inv. Timothy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?