Bassel v. MortgageIT, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Jamie Bassel and Dr. Jamie Bassel, D.C.
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc. and Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06830
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Case Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06827-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida)
January 22, 2020 Case Consolidated with lead case 19-cv-6827 (PKC). (Abdallah, Fida)
January 17, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. See Order in Lead Case, 19cv6826 dated 1/16/2020. (Abdallah, Fida)
January 16, 2020 Case Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the relatedness of the cases, and the similar issues pending on dockets 1:19-cv-06826, 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842, the Court consolidates all cases into the 19-cv-6826 docket. Any and all future entries are to be made in the 19-cv-6826 docket. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the cases and terminate 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842.All pending deadlines are adjourned sine die. The Court will hold a status conference on January 22, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida)
January 16, 2020 Cases associated. (Abdallah, Fida)
January 16, 2020 Cases association created. Lead: 1:19-cv-06826; Member: 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842. (Abdallah, Fida)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Requesting Conference by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, MortgageIT, Inc.. (Wallace, Amber)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann (As related to 19-cv-6826) for all further proceedings. Judge Edward R. Korman, Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/15/2020. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Letter by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, MortgageIT, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Wallace, Amber)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Trumbull Wallace on behalf of MortgageIT, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wallace, Amber)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants answer due by 1/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 12/11/2019. (Several, Emily)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY in Support of Aetna's Request for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Letter objecting to Aetna's request for an extension of time by Jamie Bassel, DC (Kearns, Brendan)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward R. Korman and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge I. Leo Glasser, Chief Magistrate Jud Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/9/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company from Queens Civil Court, case number CV-724305-19/QU. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12125605) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallace, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bassel v. MortgageIT, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc.
Represented By: Amber Trumbull Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Amber Trumbull Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Jamie Bassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Jamie Bassel, D.C.
Represented By: Michael Baglio, I
Represented By: Brendan J Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?