Suris v. NYP Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Defendant: NYP Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06905
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on March 17, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant NYP Holdings, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 24, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/1/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NYP Holdings, Inc.. (Mintz, Steven)
January 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. NYP Holdings, Inc. served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Segal, Mitchell)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NYP Holdings, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NYP Holdings, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12139205 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suris v. NYP Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYP Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Represented By: Mitchell Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?