D.M. v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: D.M.
Defendant: The City of New York and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv06975
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
2 Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge Margo K. Brodie no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
January 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application granted, on consent. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/2/2020.(Vallens, Adrian)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Pantalony, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Pantalony on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pantalony, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.M.. (Hartley, Erika)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.M.. The City of New York served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hartley, Erika)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.M.. New York City Department of Education served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hartley, Erika)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.M.. The City of New York served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hartley, Erika)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, filed by D.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)
December 12, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653146333 (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.M. v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Michael D. Pantalony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Michael D. Pantalony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?