Winter v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Winter
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07099
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Levine, Evelyn)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #13 and #14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Shawn Brenhouse terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/11/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. (King, Robert)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. (Spano, Frank)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION for pre motion conference to permit Rule 12b motion to dismiss complaint by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. (Brenhouse, Shawn)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Application #11 Motion for Pre Motion Conference is denied without prejudice to refiling addressed to and consistent with the chambers practices of United States District Judge DeArcy Hall, or after submission of a consent of all parties to reassignment of this action to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/28/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for pre motion conference to permit pre-answer motion to dismiss complaint by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC. (Brenhouse, Shawn)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 Letter dated January 15, 2020, addressed to Mag. Judge Gold from Attorney Michael Colihan; informing the Court of plaintiff's request for a premotion conference and attempt to seek consent of his adversary re Dkt. #9 request for extension of time to file motion for remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Denying without prejudice to resubmit after seeking consent of adversary #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Remand. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/14/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 Letter requesting extension of time by Michael Colihan. (Williams, Erica) Modified to add motion on 1/14/2020 (Gillespie, Saudia).
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on February 26, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for defendant is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Bayview Loan Servicing LLC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 27, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/4/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Letter requesting an extension of time of answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC (Brenhouse, Shawn) Modified to add motion on 1/4/2020 (Gillespie, Saudia).
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC from Supreme Court, Richmond County, case number 152554/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12171944) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Documents) (Brenhouse, Shawn)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC (Brenhouse, Shawn)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC (Brenhouse, Shawn)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC from Richmond County, Supreme Court of New York, case number 152554/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Documents) (Brenhouse, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winter v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Winter
Represented By: Michael Colihan, I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Shawn Brenhouse
Represented By: Robert Harold King
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?