Zimand v. Impremedia Operating Company, LLC
Plaintiff: David Zimand
Defendant: Impremedia Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07172
Filed: December 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Electronic entry terminating civil case) (Hong, Loan)
February 4, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (Greene, Donna)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Zimand and Settlement (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 1, 2020 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report letter by February 17, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/1/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by David Zimand (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Impremedia Operating Company, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Impremedia Operating Company, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12182329 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by David Zimand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimand v. Impremedia Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impremedia Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zimand
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?