Taggart v. Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC
Plaintiff: John Taggart
Defendant: Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07175
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 2/24/2020. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/14/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC. (Warshavsky, Oren)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Barrett Shapiro on behalf of Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Shapiro, Peter)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren J. Warshavsky on behalf of Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Warshavsky, Oren)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER TO ANSWER re #6 Summons Returned Executed: Defendant Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC Answer to the Complaint is due 2/17/2020. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on the defendant by regular and certified mail. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/3/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Taggart. Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12182623 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by John Taggart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taggart v. Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lefrak City Rent Agency, LLC
Represented By: Peter Barrett Shapiro
Represented By: Oren J. Warshavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Taggart
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?