McNear v. Trulieve Cannabis Corp. et al
Plaintiff: David McNear
Defendant: Trulieve Cannabis Corp., Mohan Srinivasan and Kim Rivers
Interested Party: Monica Acerra
Case Number: 1:2019cv07289
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in Case No. 2:20-cv-00775 (LDH)(SJB) indicates a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 2/12/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Alexander Hood on behalf of Monica Acerra (aty to be noticed) (Hood, J. Alexander)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Alan Lieberman on behalf of Monica Acerra (aty to be noticed) (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 29, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Tyler Wayne Highful Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/22/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12282903. by Kim Rivers, Mohan Srinivasan, Trulieve Cannabis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Highful, Tyler)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Biles on behalf of Kim Rivers, Mohan Srinivasan, Trulieve Cannabis Corp. (notification declined or already on case) (Biles, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Srimath Saliya Subasinghe Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/17/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12264547. by Kim Rivers, Mohan Srinivasan, Trulieve Cannabis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Subasinghe, Srimath)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Michael J. Biles Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/14/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Jessica L. England Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/14/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12248662. by Kim Rivers, Mohan Srinivasan, Trulieve Cannabis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Biles, Michael)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12236151. by Kim Rivers, Mohan Srinivasan, Trulieve Cannabis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (England, Jessica)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Richard Bessette on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Bessette, Paul)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kim Rivers, Mohan Srinivasan, Trulieve Cannabis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kim Rivers, Mohan Srinivasan, Trulieve Cannabis Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12201398 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by David McNear. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Trulieve, #4 Proposed Summons to Rivers, #5 Proposed Summons to Srinivasan) (Kim, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNear v. Trulieve Cannabis Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trulieve Cannabis Corp.
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: Paul Richard Bessette
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Michael Biles
Represented By: Tyler Wayne Highful
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohan Srinivasan
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: Paul Richard Bessette
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Michael Biles
Represented By: Tyler Wayne Highful
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Rivers
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: Paul Richard Bessette
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Michael Biles
Represented By: Tyler Wayne Highful
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McNear
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Monica Acerra
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?