Chen v. Asian Terrace Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ling Chen
Defendant: Vickie Sue Li, Asian Terrace Restaurant, Inc., Asian Moon of Massapequa Park Inc and Asian Moon Restaurant Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv07313
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ANSWER Asian Moon Restaurant Corp answer due 3/10/2020; Asian Moon of Massapequa Park Inc answer due 3/10/2020; Asian Terrace Restaurant, Inc. answer due 3/10/2020; Vickie Sue Li answer due 3/10/2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/19/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Answer the Complaint until March 10, 2020 by Ling Chen (Troy, John)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea E. Batres on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Batres, Andrea)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter Request to Adjourn the Initial Pre-Trial Conference by Ling Chen (Troy, John)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #14 Letter Request to Adjourn the Initial Pre-Trial Conference. First, this letter should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion" since it seeks relief from the Court. Do not refile the letter. Second, the request to adjourn is granted in part; the Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2020 at 10:30 am in Chambers 704S. Third, the parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #9 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/13/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ling Chen. Asian Moon Restaurant Corp served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photo of Manager Wendy) (Troy, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ling Chen. Asian Moon of Massapequa Park Inc served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photo of Manager Wendy) (Troy, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ling Chen. Asian Terrace Restaurant, Inc. served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photo of Manager Wendy) (Troy, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ling Chen. Vickie Sue Li served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photo of Manager Wendy) (Troy, John)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 2/19/2020 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/9/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leanghour Lim on behalf of Ling Chen (aty to be noticed) (Lim, Leanghour)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schweitzer on behalf of Ling Chen (aty to be noticed) (Schweitzer, Aaron)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Ling Chen (Troy, John)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Ling Chen (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Troy, John)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Asian Terrace Restaurant, Inc., Vickie Sue Li, Asian Moon of Massapequa Park Inc, Asian Moon Restaurant Corp filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12234457 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Ling Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited) (Troy, John)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE : Attorney was notified via email([johntroy@troypllc.com]) on 1/8/2020 to file documents on this case: Mr.Troy, Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summon and pay the Civil Filing for the following case so that we may process this case. If you should have any questions, please feel free to contact me. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Asian Terrace Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ling Chen
Represented By: Aaron Schweitzer
Represented By: Leanghour Lim
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Sue Li
Represented By: Andrea E. Batres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asian Terrace Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea E. Batres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asian Moon of Massapequa Park Inc
Represented By: Andrea E. Batres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asian Moon Restaurant Corp
Represented By: Andrea E. Batres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?