United States of America v. $44,261
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $44,261
Case Number: 1:2020cv00161
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Affidavit of publication, legal notice was published on the official government website www.forfeiture.gov, beginning on January 22, 2020 and ending on February 20, 2020 (Mantell, Laura)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie for all further proceedings. Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/23/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Articles in Rem: that in order to avoid forfeiture of theDefendant Funds, any person claiming an interest in, or right against, the Defendant Funds shall file a verified claim identifying the specific property claimed by the claimant and stating the claimant's interest in the property. (See order for details). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 1/14/2020. (Ramesar, Thameera)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Y. Levy on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barbara)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $44,261 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Warrant for Arrest) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $44,261
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $44,261
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laura D. Mantell
Represented By: Barbara Y. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?