Landin et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Officer Brett Granowetter and Yajaira A. Landin
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.,, C. R. Bard, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon LLC and Tissue Science Laboratories Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00196
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 The case of Landin et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al, has been transferred from West Virginia Southern to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 1:20-cv-00196-MKB-SJB. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Marziliano, August)
January 10, 2020 Filing 62 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-23995. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 7, 2020 Filing 61 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #57 Continued, ECF #6852 - Notice of Adoption, #2 Exhibit ECF #6860 - Notice of Adoption, #3 Exhibit ECF #6864 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #6874 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #6874 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #6874 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #6875 - Memo ISO Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF #6878 - Notice of Adoption, #9 Exhibit ECF #6926 - Notice of Adoption, #10 Exhibit ECF #6939 - Notice of Adoption, #11 Exhibit ECF #6940 - Notice of Adoption, #12 Exhibit ECF #6958 - Notice of Adoption, #13 Exhibit ECF #6960 - Notice of Adoption, #14 Exhibit ECF #6965 - Notice of Adoption, #15 Exhibit ECF #6973 - Notice of Adoption, #16 Exhibit ECF #6998 - Notice of Adoption, #17 Exhibit ECF #7038 - Notice of Adoption, #18 Exhibit ECF #7045 - Opposition to Motion, #19 Exhibit ECF #7085 - Amended Adoption, #20 Exhibit ECF #7100 - Notice of Adoption, #21 Exhibit ECF #7119 - Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #7123 - Notice of Adoption, #23 Exhibit ECF #7133 - Notice of Adoption, #24 Exhibit ECF #7143 - Notice of Adoption, #25 Exhibit ECF #7177 - Notice of Adoption, #26 Exhibit ECF #7183 - Reply to Motion)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 60 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #57 Continued, ECF #3626 Part 1 - Motion to Limit, #2 Exhibit ECF #3626 Part 2 - Motion to Limit, #3 Exhibit ECF #3630 - Memo ISO Motion, #4 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 1 - Opposition to Motion, #5 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 2 - Opposition to Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 3 - Opposition to Motion, #7 Exhibit ECF #3767 Part 4 - Opposition to Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF #3790 Part 1 - Opposition to Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF #3790 Part 12- Opposition to Motion, #10 Exhibit ECF #3790 Part 3 - Opposition to Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF #3844 - Reply, #12 Exhibit ECF #3855 - Reply, #13 Exhibit ECF #3865 - Reply, #14 Exhibit ECF #5076 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #5077 - Memo ISO Motion, #16 Exhibit ECF #5124 - Response to Motion, #17 Exhibit ECF #5178 - Reply to Motion, #18 Exhibit ECF #5332 - Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #5333 - Memo ISO Motion, #20 Exhibit ECF #5482 - Response to Motion, #21 Exhibit ECF #5548 - Reply to Motion, #22 Exhibit ECF #6648 - Notice of Adoption, #23 Exhibit ECF #6804 - Notice of Adoption, #24 Exhibit ECF #6821 - Notice of Adoption, #25 Exhibit ECF #6824 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 59 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #57 Continued, ECF #2232 - Reply to Motion, #2 Exhibit ECF #2235 - Reply to Motion, #3 Exhibit ECF #2287 Part 1 - Response to Motion, #4 Exhibit ECF #2287 Part 2 - Response to Motion, #5 Exhibit ECF #2297 - Reply to Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF #2418 - Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit ECF #2552 Part 1 - Response to Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF #2552 Part 2 - Response to Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF #2552 Part 3 - Response to Motion, #10 Exhibit ECF #2759 - Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #2760 - Memo ISO Motion, #12 Exhibit ECF #2817 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #2818 - Memo ISO Motion, #14 Exhibit ECF #2825 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #2826 - Memo ISO Motion, #16 Exhibit ECF #2907 - Response to Motion, #17 Exhibit ECF #2910 - Supplemental Response to Notice of Adoption, #18 Exhibit ECF #2931 - Opposition to Motion, #19 Exhibit ECF #2942 - Opposition to Motion, #20 Exhibit ECF #3017 - Reply to Motion, #21 Exhibit ECF #3024 - Reply to Motion, #22 Exhibit ECF #3053 - Reply to Motion, #23 Exhibit ECF #3619 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #3619 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2949 - Opposition to Motion)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 58 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #57 Continued, ECF #2047 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 4 - Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 5 - Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 6 - Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 7 - Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 8 - Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 9 - Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 10 - Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 11 - Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 12 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 13 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #2047 Part 14 - Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #2060 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #2065 - Memo ISO Motion, #16 Exhibit ECF #2068 - Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #2072 - Memo ISO Motion, #18 Exhibit ECF #2134 - Opposition to Motion, #19 Exhibit ECF #2143 - Response to Motion, #20 Exhibit ECF #2183 - Opposition to Motion, #21 Exhibit ECF #2190 - Response to Motion, #22 Exhibit ECF #2205 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #2205 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #2205 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2206 - Memo ISO Motion)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 57 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #238 - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit ECF #239 - Master Answer - Ethicon, Inc., #3 Exhibit ECF #241 - Master Answer - Johnson & Johnson, #4 Exhibit ECF #262 - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF #263 - Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF #528 - Position Statement, #7 Exhibit ECF #544 - Position Statement, #8 Exhibit ECF #546 - Response to Position Statement, #9 Exhibit ECF #896 - Brief, #10 Exhibit ECF #952 - Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF #953 - Memo ISO Motion, #12 Exhibit ECF #996 - Notice of Supplement, #13 Exhibit ECF #1022 - Response to Motion, #14 Exhibit ECF #1041 - Reply, #15 Exhibit ECF #1043 - Proposed Pretrial Order, #16 Exhibit ECF #1056 - Notice of Supplemental Authority, #17 Exhibit ECF #1099 - Request for Clarification, #18 Exhibit ECF #1100 - Brief ISO Request for Clarification, #19 Exhibit ECF #1119 - Opposition to Request for Clarification, #20 Exhibit ECF #1131 - Reply, #21 Exhibit ECF #1986 - Amended Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #1988 - Amended Memo ISO Motion, #23 Exhibit ECF #2044 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #2044 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #2045 - Memo ISO Motion)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/8/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/09/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/08/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/19/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin to #53 Show Cause Order (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #44 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, LLC, Yajaira A. Landin, Brett Granowetter to Voluntarily Dismiss Ethicon, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/21/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Melanie H. Muhlstock, dated October 25, 2018, filed on behalf of Yajaira A. Landin, Brett Granowetter re: #48 Response In Opposition (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Raymond C. Silverman, dated October 25, 2018, filed on behalf of Yajaira A. Landin, Brett Granowetter re: #48 Response In Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin in opposition to #45 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #45 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 44 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, LLC, Yajaira A. Landin, Brett Granowetter to Voluntarily Dismiss Ethicon, LLC. (Kabbash, Maha) (Modified on 10/17/2018 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Brett Granowetter, Justin Prendergast, Yasmine Prendergast, Rudy Landin, Katy Granowetter, Barry Granowetter, Angela Pena on 10/04/2018 at 4:30 p.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Extend Time to Complete Discovery to October 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Extend Time to Complete Discovery to October 5, 2018. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 40 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Charles Ascher-Walsh on October 5, 2018 at 9 a.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Charles Ascher-Walsh on September 28, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin of John Miklos, M.D. on September 21, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin in opposition to #34 Third Amended Notice of Video Deposition (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (Dismissing Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc., Tissue Science Laboratories and/or Sofradim Production SAS with Prejudice) the #33 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is GRANTED; the C. R. Bard, Inc., Tissue Science Laboratories, and/or Sofradim Production SAS defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the actions listed on the attached Exhibit A; for any case listed on Exhibit A that is on the pending inactive docket, the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove only the MDL Bard Inactive flag. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/13/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 34 THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Yajaira A. Landin on 08/15/2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION by Tissue Science Laboratories Limited, C. R. Bard, Inc. to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Hobbs, Micah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin for Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 29 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Yajaira A. Landin on June 19, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Yajaira A. Landin on 06/06/2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to #22 Notice of Video Deposition by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things, Interrogatories, and Requests for Admissions. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin for First Request for Interrogatories, Admissions, and Production of Documents. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN CERTAIN PARTIES by Tissue Science Laboratories Limited, C. R. Bard, Inc., Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin. (Hobbs, Micah) (Modified on 5/18/2018 to add party filers and to convert event to Stipulation. (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Yajaira A. Landin on 05/24/2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Diana Katz Gerstel on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Gerstel, Diana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Crawford, Kelly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin of Gil Levy, M.D. on May 24, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Brett Granowetter, Yajaira A. Landin. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
March 14, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Ethicon, LLC served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
February 4, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
February 4, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
February 4, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
January 2, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Bird, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
December 26, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
December 13, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
December 12, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Deborah A. Moeller on behalf of Tissue Science Laboratories Limited. (Moeller, Deborah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
December 4, 2013 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 12/4/2013. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/24/2013, answer due 1/23/2014. (North, Richard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
November 27, 2013 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Deborah A. Moeller on 11/25/2013. Tissue Science Laboratories Limited waiver mailed on 11/24/2013, answer due 1/23/2014. (Silverman, Raymond) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 71 (Scheduling of Discovery Conferences) entered on 09/30/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]
September 30, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2682177. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landin et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer Brett Granowetter
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C Silverman
Represented By: Jerrold S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yajaira A. Landin
Represented By: Melanie H. Muhlstock
Represented By: Raymond C Silverman
Represented By: Jerrold S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.,
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tissue Science Laboratories Limited
Represented By: Deborah A Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?