Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Sabodash et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Cloud Billing, Inc., Valeriy Kotlyar, Anetta Kalsin, Valeriy Sabodash, M.D. and John Doe Defendants "1" - "10"
Case Number: 1:2020cv00258
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Valeriy Kotlyar. (Villanti, Christopher)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond is extended to March 18, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/3/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
March 3, 2020 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Cloud Billing, Inc., Anetta Kalsin, Valeriy Sabodash, MD. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Horn, Charles)
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Beth Strong on behalf of Cloud Billing, Inc., Anetta Kalsin (aty to be noticed) (Strong, Jennifer)
March 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Beth Strong on behalf of Valeriy Sabodash, MD (aty to be noticed) (Strong, Jennifer)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Horn on behalf of Cloud Billing, Inc., Anetta Kalsin (aty to be noticed) (Horn, Charles)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Horn on behalf of Valeriy Sabodash, MD (aty to be noticed) (Horn, Charles)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The answer deadline has been extended to March 18, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/28/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Valeriy Kotlyar. (Villanti, Christopher)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Anetta Kalsin served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Valeriy Kotlyar served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Cloud Billing, Inc. served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Gorton on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Gorton, Sean)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on April 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to ensure that defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/17/2020. (Riquelme, Claudia)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cloud Billing, Inc., John Doe Defendants "1" - "10", Anetta Kalsin, Valeriy Kotlyar, Valeriy Sabodash, MD. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cloud Billing, Inc., John Doe Defendants "1" - "10", Anetta Kalsin, Valeriy Kotlyar, Valeriy Sabodash, MD filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12259681 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Fraudulent Claims Identified To-Date, #4 Exhibit 2 - AANEM Recommended Policy, #5 Exhibit 3 - Relevant DOI Opinion Letters) (Sirignano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Sabodash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloud Billing, Inc.
Represented By: Charles H. Horn
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeriy Kotlyar
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Villanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anetta Kalsin
Represented By: Charles H. Horn
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeriy Sabodash, M.D.
Represented By: Charles H. Horn
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants "1" - "10"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?