Suris v. Mindgeek Holdings Sarl et al
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Defendant: Mindgeek Holdings Sarl d/b/a Pornhub.com d/b/a Redtube.com, d/b/a Youporn.com, Mindgeek Los Angeles d/b/a Pornhub.com d/b/a Redtube.com d/b/a Youporn.com
Case Number: 1:2020cv00284
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mindgeek Holdings Sarl answer due 3/27/2020; Mindgeek Los Angeles answer due 3/27/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 2/14/2020. (Marino, Janine)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mindgeek Holdings Sarl, Mindgeek Los Angeles. (Nguyen, Elaine)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Mindgeek Los Angeles served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Segal, Mitchell)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Mindgeek Holdings Sarl served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Segal, Mitchell)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mindgeek Holdings Sarl, Mindgeek Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
January 17, 2020 NOTICE re #3 Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening : Due to the amount of errors made when filing this case, Plaintiff counsel is advised to refer to the Attorney Case Opening Video Tutorial/Manual before filing another case electronically. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mindgeek Holdings Sarl d/b/a Pornhub.com d/b/a Redtube.com, d/b/a Youporn.com, Mindgeek Los Angeles d/b/a Pornhub.com d/b/a Redtube.com d/b/a Youporn.com filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12264551 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suris v. Mindgeek Holdings Sarl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Represented By: Mitchell Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindgeek Holdings Sarl d/b/a Pornhub.com d/b/a Redtube.com, d/b/a Youporn.com, Mindgeek Los Angeles d/b/a Pornhub.com d/b/a Redtube.com d/b/a Youporn.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?