ECP Property II LLC v. Joseph S. Norton et al
Plaintiff: ECP Property II LLC
Defendant: 35 Kermit Place LLC, 29 Kermit Place LLC, 771 Hopkinson Boyland LLC, 31 Kermit Owner LLC and Joseph S. Norton
Case Number: 1:2020cv00303
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: I Leo Glasser
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ECP Property II LLC. 771 Hopkinson Boyland LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Young, Gordon)
March 16, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ECP Property II LLC. 35 Kermit Place LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Young, Gordon)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ECP Property II LLC. 31 Kermit Owner LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Young, Gordon)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ECP Property II LLC. 29 Kermit Place LLC served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Young, Gordon)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ECP Property II LLC. Joseph S. Norton served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Young, Gordon)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Noel Norton, Tameka Norton, Thema Norton, per #11 . (Layne, Monique)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ECP Property II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Summons) (Young, Gordon)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dahiya, Karamvir)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by ECP Property II LLC (Young, Gordon)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by ECP Property II LLC (Young, Gordon)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by ECP Property II LLC (Young, Gordon)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by ECP Property II LLC (Young, Gordon)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by ECP Property II LLC (Young, Gordon)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12269980 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by ECP Property II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Young, Gordon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2020: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/21/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECP Property II LLC v. Joseph S. Norton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECP Property II LLC
Represented By: Gordon S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 35 Kermit Place LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 29 Kermit Place LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 771 Hopkinson Boyland LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 31 Kermit Owner LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph S. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?