Eilat Management Corp. et al v. Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eilat Management Corp. and The George Units LLC
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company and Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00978
Filed: February 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time until 5/11/20 to Answer as to all defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/8/2020. (Marino, Janine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Silverberg, Philip)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/27/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/13/2020. (Marino, Janine)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eilat Management Corp., The George Units LLC. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Zelmanovitz, Joseph)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Silverberg, Philip)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eilat Management Corp., The George Units LLC. Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Zelmanovitz, Joseph)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Westchester summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12431272 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Eilat Management Corp., The George Units LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Zelmanovitz, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eilat Management Corp. et al v. Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip C. Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Philip C. Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eilat Management Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Zelmanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The George Units LLC
Represented By: Joseph Zelmanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?