Zapata v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Luz M. Zapata
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01058
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Shearer, Douglas)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on June 2, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defendant's counsel is directed to ensure that plaintiff is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/28/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 27, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-12451439 (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 27, 2020 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Queens, case number 717578/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shearer, Douglas) Modified on 2/27/2020 (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapata v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz M. Zapata
Represented By: Robert Alan Peirce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?