Gumus v. Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi et al
Plaintiff: Yasemin Gumus
Defendant: Turkish Airlines, Inc. and Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi
Case Number: 1:2020cv01084
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order by Yasemin Gumus (Zeitzoff, David)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Initial Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The attorneys are directed to use the Toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 and Access Code 5496961# to participate in the scheduled telephone conference. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 4/24/2020. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/2/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi, Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Yasemin Gumus (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi, Turkish Airlines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12457795 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yasemin Gumus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Bohrer, Abram)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gumus v. Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turkish Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasemin Gumus
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?