Doe v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: The City of New York and New York City Police Department ("NYPD") Officers John Joes #1-6 and Jennifer Joes #1-2
Case Number: 1:2020cv01344
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant City of New York (the "City"), with plaintiff's consent, requests an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. ECF No. 8. The request is granted. The City shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by June 2, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/1/2020. (Panjini, Madhura)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The City of New York. (Kruk, Carolyn)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew K. Jondahl on behalf of Jane Doe (aty to be noticed) (Jondahl, Andrew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. The City of New York served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New York City Police Department ("NYPD") Officers John Joes #1-6 and Jennifer Joes #1-2, The City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Lois Bloom. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document - Motion to Proceed Anonymously by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane Doe in Support of Her Motion to Proceed Anonymously, #2 Memorandum in Support - Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Her Motion to Proceed Anonymously) (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Police Department ("NYPD") Officers John Joes #1-6 and Jennifer Joes #1-2, The City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12530483 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Defendant The City of New York) (Rosenfeld, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department ("NYPD") Officers John Joes #1-6 and Jennifer Joes #1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Katherine Ruth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Andrew K. Jondahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?