Osuji v. Azie
Appellant: Chukwuma E. Osuji
Appellee: Stella Azie
Case Number: 1:2020cv01365
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellant's #4 request for an enlargement of time to submit the statement of issues is granted nunc pro tunc. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/13/2020. (Marks, Miriam)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 Appellant's BRIEF by Chukwuma E. Osuji. Appellee Brief due by 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Fairchild, Steven)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court has noticed that counsel for plaintiff has not efiled documents himself but rather has utilized the Clerk's Office. Going forward, counsel must efile documents himself and not submit them through the Clerks Office. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/20/2020. (Abdallah, Fida)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Statements Of Facts filed by counsel Steven R. Fairchild, Esq. o/b/o Appellant. (Layne, Monique)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Letter dtd. 4/15/2020 to Judge Chen from counsel for appellant Osuji, "retroactively requesting an enlargement of time to submit the statement of issues," due to the foregoing reasons herein. (Layne, Monique)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Royal Fairchild on behalf of Chukwuma E. Osuji (aty to be noticed). (Layne, Monique)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Bankruptcy Record Received. Notice to all parties, in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), that the record has been received or is available electronically. Parties shall now follow briefing schedule as set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Specifically, appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days of this notice, the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants brief, and the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellees brief, but a reply brief must be filed at least 7 days before scheduled argument. (Attachments: #1 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP, #2 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP: Notice Recipients) (Brown, Marc)
March 18, 2020 Notice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-19-01021., filed by Chukwuma E. Osuji. (Attachments: #1 #26 Denying Discharge, #2 #28 Notice to Parties, #3 #29 BK documents, #4 #29-1 Transmittal, #5 #29-2 Notice Recipients) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osuji v. Azie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chukwuma E. Osuji
Represented By: Steven Royal Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stella Azie
Represented By: H. Bruce Bronson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?