Murray v. Nazareth Regional High School et al
Plaintiff: William J Murray, III
Defendant: Nazareth Regional High School f/k/a Nazareth High School, Bishop of Brooklyn, Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn, Board of Regents of the University of the State of New York, John Doe 1- 10 and Xaverian Brothers USA Inc a/k/a Congregation of St. Francis Xavier
Case Number: 1:2020cv01471
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/24/2020. (Marino, Janine)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/24/2020. (Marino, Janine)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by William J Murray, III (Smith, Peter)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bishop of Brooklyn, Board of Regents of the University of the State of New York, Nazareth Regional High School f/k/a Nazareth High School, Xaverian Brothers USA Inc a/k/a Congregation of St. Francis Xavier. (Attachments: #1 Board of Regents summons, #2 Xaverian summons, #3 Bishop summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Liza L. Roys, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12607787. by William J Murray, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza Roys, #2 Supreme Court of Texas Cert of Good Standing) (Smith, Peter)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy A. Bearb, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12589889. by William J Murray, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy A. Bearb, Esq., #2 Supreme Court of Texas Cert of Good Standing, #3 State Bar of Texas Cert of Good Standing, #4 Washington State Bar Cert of Good Standing) (Smith, Peter)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT William J. Murray III against Bishop of Brooklyn, Board of Regents of the University of the State of New York, John Doe 1- 10, Nazareth Regional High School f/k/a Nazareth High School, Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn, Xaverian Brothers USA Inc a/k/a Congregation of St. Francis Xavier filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12563472 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by William J Murray, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Bishop, #3 Proposed Summons Nazareth, #4 Proposed Summons Regents, #5 Proposed Summons Xaverians) (Smith, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Nazareth Regional High School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Murray, III
Represented By: Peter W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nazareth Regional High School f/k/a Nazareth High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop of Brooklyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1- 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xaverian Brothers USA Inc a/k/a Congregation of St. Francis Xavier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?