Lyn v. Savera Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DEBBIE LYN
Defendant: KENDALL HARRINGTON, INDUSTRIAL STEAM CLEANING OF LONG ISLAND, INC., SAVERA INDUSTRIES, INC. and Industrial Steam Cleaning Of Long Island, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01516
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Kendall Harrington, Industrial Steam Cleaning Of Long Island, Inc, Savera Industries, Inc.. (Carbonaro, Joseph)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference is set for 6/29/2020 @ 2:45 PM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Telephone conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:45 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1516. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/15/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
April 15, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - 5/22/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/15/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kendall Harrington, Industrial Steam Cleaning Of Long Island, Inc, Savera Industries, Inc.. (Carbonaro, Joseph)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Carbonaro on behalf of Kendall Harrington, Industrial Steam Cleaning Of Long Island, Inc, Savera Industries, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Carbonaro, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alanna Rose Sakovits on behalf of Debbie Lyn (aty to be noticed) (Sakovits, Alanna)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kendall Harrington, Industrial Steam Cleaning Of Long Island, Inc, Savera Industries, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by DEBBIE LYN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lusher, LaDonna)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENDALL HARRINGTON, INDUSTRIAL STEAM CLEANING OF LONG ISLAND, INC., SAVERA INDUSTRIES, INC. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12576076 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by DEBBIE LYN. (Lusher, LaDonna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyn v. Savera Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENDALL HARRINGTON
Represented By: Joseph W. Carbonaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL STEAM CLEANING OF LONG ISLAND, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVERA INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph W. Carbonaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Steam Cleaning Of Long Island, Inc
Represented By: Joseph W. Carbonaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBBIE LYN
Represented By: LaDonna Marie Lusher
Represented By: Alanna Rose Sakovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?