Rose v. Central Mortgage Company
Plaintiff: Hansen Rose
Defendant: CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY d/b/a ARVEST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY, Central Mortgage Company and U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, National Association, As Trustee, Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association, As Trustee For Mo
Case Number: 1:2020cv01520
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Marie Carrera on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, National Association, As Trustee, Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association, As Trustee For Mo (aty to be noticed) (Carrera, Dana)
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hansen Rose. U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, National Association, As Trustee, Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association, As Trustee For Mo waiver sent on 5/19/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Christou, Andreas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, National Association, As Trustee, Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association, As Trustee For Mo. (Galeano, Sonia)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Anderson on behalf of Hansen Rose (aty to be noticed) (Anderson, Mark)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing: Defendant Central Mortgage Company, only. See entry #13 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/19/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal only as to Central Mortgage Company by Hansen Rose (Christou, Andreas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. by Hansen Rose (Christou, Andreas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, National Association, As Trustee, Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association, As Trustee For Morgan Stanley Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-6XS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-6XS, filed by Hansen Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment) (Christou, Andreas)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of Central Mortgage Company (aty to be noticed) (Macy, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 20, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/13/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Central Mortgage Company. (Tuffarelli, Nicholas)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Tuffarelli on behalf of Central Mortgage Company (aty to be noticed) (Tuffarelli, Nicholas)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hansen Rose. Central Mortgage Company served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020. (Christou, Andreas)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Central Mortgage Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Hansen Rose (Christou, Andreas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Hansen Rose (Christou, Andreas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY d/b/a ARVEST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12577244 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Hansen Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment) (Christou, Andreas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hansen Rose
Represented By: Andreas Euripides Christou
Represented By: Mark Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY d/b/a ARVEST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Represented By: Nicholas Tuffarelli
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest To Bank Of America, National Association, As Trustee, Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association, As Trustee For Mo
Represented By: Dana Marie Carrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?