Blandon v. Attorney General, State of New York
Petitioner: David Mairena Blandon
Respondent: Attorney General State of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv01529
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02265. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 19, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to David Mairena Blandon at ID No. A 205708906, Buffalo Federal Detention Facility, 4250 Federal Drive, Batavia, NY 14020. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/24/2020.]
March 17, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/24/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/17/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/24/2020.]
March 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/24/2020.]
March 11, 2020 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #1 by David Mairena Blandon. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/24/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by David Mairena Blandon. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/24/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 AFFIDAVIT ACCOMPANYING MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by David Mairena Blandon. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blandon v. Attorney General, State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Mairena Blandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?