Bavaro v. Polymeropoulos, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bavaro
Defendant: Kenneth Bate, Vincent J. Milano, Police Officer James Kelly, H. Thomas Watkins, Richard W. Dugan, Gian Piero Reverberi, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Michael F. Cola
Case Number: 1:2020cv01584
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Lois Bloom
2 Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Cases associated., Case Consolidated., Civil Case Terminated. (Galeano, Sonia)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 4/1/2020. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: As to consolidation of cases, the serving and filing of a consolidated complaint and a date where defendants either serve and file an answer or a pre-motion letter application. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/1/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Actions and Appointing Lead Counsel by Michael Bavaro (Holleman, William)
March 27, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 27, 2020 The case of Bavaro v. Polymeropoulos, M.D. et al, has been transferred from District of Delaware to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv1584. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 27, 2020 Filing 27 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 27, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01701. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 27, 2020 Case transferred Electronically to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York per Stipulation Transferring Case (D.I. #25 ) (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York by Michael Bavaro. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings, ORDER STAYING CASE pending the resolution of Williams v. Polymeropoulos, No. 1:19-cv-04293-FB-LB (E.D.N.Y.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/18/2020. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings filed by Gian Piero Reverberi, James Kelly, Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, H. Thomas Watkins, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Vincent J. Milano, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Richard W. Dugan. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/10/2020. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon.(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #21 Reply Brief, by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings filed by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
November 19, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the Memorandum of Law at D.I. #20 has been removed and replaced with the corrected version to comply with Judge Connolly's filing requirements. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings filed by Michael Bavaro.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/25/2019. (Bennett, Blake) (Main Document 20 replaced on 11/19/2019) (fms). [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SO ORDERED, re #18 Stipulation filed by Gian Piero Reverberi, James Kelly, Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, H. Thomas Watkins, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Vincent J. Milano, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Richard W. Dugan. Set Briefing Schedule: re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings. (Answering Brief due 11/18/2019., Reply Brief due 12/6/2019.) See Stipulation for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/12/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings, and Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings filed by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/14/2019. (Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings - filed by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Local Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to December 16, 2019 filed by Gian Piero Reverberi, James Kelly, Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, H. Thomas Watkins, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Vincent J. Milano, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Richard W. Dugan, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Kenneth Bate answer due 12/16/2019; Michael F. Cola answer due 12/16/2019; Richard W. Dugan answer due 12/16/2019; James Kelly answer due 12/16/2019; Vincent J. Milano answer due 12/16/2019; Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D. answer due 12/16/2019; Gian Piero Reverberi answer due 12/16/2019; Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 12/16/2019; H. Thomas Watkins answer due 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/9/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to December 16, 2019 - filed by Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Mason, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. James Kelly served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Gian Piero Reverberi served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. H. Thomas Watkins served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Michael F. Cola served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Richard W. Dugan served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Vincent J. Milano served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Kenneth Bate served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bavaro. Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kenneth Bate on 9/11/2019; Michael F. Cola on 9/11/2019; Richard W. Dugan on 9/11/2019; James Kelly on 9/11/2019; Vincent J. Milano on 9/11/2019; Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D. on 9/11/2019; Gian Piero Reverberi on 9/11/2019; Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/11/2019; H. Thomas Watkins on 9/11/2019 (*2 Copies of summons were issued for each Defendant). (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 11, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Kenneth Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D., Gian Piero Reverberi, H. Thomas Watkins - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2728550.) - filed by Michael Bavaro. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/12/2019) (kmd). [Transferred from Delaware on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bavaro v. Polymeropoulos, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Bate
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J. Milano
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer James Kelly
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Thomas Watkins
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Dugan
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gian Piero Reverberi
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, M.D.
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Cola
Represented By: Daniel Alan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bavaro
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?