Rusinyak v. New York City School Support Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Rusinyak
Defendant: New York City School Support Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01698
Filed: April 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference has been scheduled for Tuesday, June 16, 2020 at 3:45 PM. The conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 3:45 PM on June 15, 2020. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1698. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/15/2020. (Hazelwood, John)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 Letter re: Status by New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Weinberg, Harry)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report by 6/8/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/6/2020. (Hazelwood, John)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dated 4/6/20 that plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint by April 20, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/6/2020 ) *Order forwarded for mailing. (Guzzi, Roseann)
April 6, 2020 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 5, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Weinberg, Harry)
April 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by Harry Mark Weinberg on behalf of New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Small Claims Summons and Endorsed Complaint, #2 Exhibit CBA) (Weinberg, Harry)
April 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New York City School Support Services, Inc. from Civil Court of the City of New York, Kings County, Small Claims Part, case number 651 SCK 2020 1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12634731) (Weinberg, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rusinyak v. New York City School Support Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City School Support Services, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Mark Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rusinyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?