Gellner et al v. Kennedy et al
Plaintiff: Chad Gellner, Melvyn Klein and Matthew Rufo
Defendant: Tilray, Inc., Rebekah Dopp, Christine St. Clare, Maryscott Greenwood, Mark Castaneda, Michael Auerbach and Brendan Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2020cv01768
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case; Case closed. So Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/17/2020. (Cubano, Jazmin)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chad Gellner, Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo (McKenna, Thomas)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Anna Miao on behalf of Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Miao, Tiffany)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin on behalf of Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (York-Erwin, Genevieve)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is denied at this time because the affidavit in support of the motion has not been properly notarized and does not fully comply with Local Rule 1.39(c). Counsel is permitted until 5/27/2020 to supplement the application with an updated affidavit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/20/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglas W. Greene Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12812473. by Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas W. Greene, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Greene, Douglas)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/7/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein (as related to 20-cv-1240)for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 5/6/2020. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 4/22/2020 (Bowens, Priscilla).
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Chad Gellner, Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo (McKenna, Thomas)
April 20, 2020 SECOND NOTICE: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 13, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit completed (2 PAGE FORM) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Auerbach, Mark Castaneda, Rebekah Dopp, Maryscott Greenwood, Brendan Kennedy, Christine St. Clare, Tilray, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12662957 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Melvyn Klein, Matthew Rufo, Chad Gellner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McKenna, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gellner et al v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilray, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Dopp
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine St. Clare
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryscott Greenwood
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Castaneda
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Auerbach
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Kennedy
Represented By: Tiffany Anna Miao
Represented By: Genevieve Graeme York-Erwin
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Gellner
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rufo
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?