Chader v. TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.
Plaintiff: Amel Chader
Defendant: TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01912
Filed: April 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Patrice E Hendriksen shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/18/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph F. Yenouskas shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/18/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12931893. by TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Hendriksen, Patrice)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12931848. by TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Yenouskas, Joseph)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp. identifying Corporate Parent TIAA FSB Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate TIAA for TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.. (Sussman, Alyssa)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on July 10, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel shall confer with each other, complete the attached initial conference questionnaire and electronically file two days prior to the conference. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 26, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/22/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.. (Sussman, Alyssa)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Sussman on behalf of TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Sussman, Alyssa)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amel Chader. TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp. served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/25/2020. (Fraietta, Philip)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.. (Sica, Michele) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/8/2020) (Brown, Marc).
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele)
April 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)
April 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Amel Chader re #1 Complaint, Request for Issuance of Summons (Fraietta, Philip)
April 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12720754 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Amel Chader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chader v. TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA, FSB f/k/a EverBank Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amel Chader
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?