International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO ("IAM") et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Association of Machinists Aerospace Workers District Lodge 141 and International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO ("IAM")
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02045
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Order Dismissing Case: The notice of voluntary dismissal at #5 is so-ordered. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 5/21/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by International Association of Machinists Aerospace Workers District Lodge 141, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO ("IAM") (Grunert, John)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United Airlines, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12757187 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO ("IAM"), International Association of Machinists Aerospace Workers District Lodge 141. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grunert, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO ("IAM") et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Machinists Aerospace Workers District Lodge 141
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers AFL-CIO ("IAM")
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?