Moulton v. MCCROSSON et al
Plaintiff: Keith Moulton
Defendant: ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., JANET K. COOPER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, MICHAEL FABER, CAREY E. BOND, VINCENT PALAZZOLO and WALTER PAULICK
Case Number: 1:2020cv02092
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
2 Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
3 Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Stipulation, Cases associated 20-cv-05454(ENV)(CLP). SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 3/22/2021. (Almonte, Giselle)
March 23, 2021 Case Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02092-ENV-CLP, 2:20-cv-05454-ENV-CLP (Almonte, Giselle)
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING DERIVATIVE ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND STAYING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS by Keith Moulton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Glancy Firm Bio, #2 Exhibit B - Keller Firm Bio) (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING CASE: This Action is hereby stayed (see Order for further detail). So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/27/2021. (Almonte, Giselle)
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Consolidated Action by CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON (Bongiorno, Michael)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Mitchell on behalf of CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON (aty to be noticed) (Mitchell, Cassandra)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Bridge on behalf of CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON (aty to be noticed) (Bridge, Charles)
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans on behalf of CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON (aty to be noticed) (Kaplan-Marans, Tamar)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON (aty to be noticed) (Bongiorno, Michael)
December 23, 2020 ELECTRONIC STIPULATION AND ORDER re. #13 : Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise to respond to the Complaint is extended to 1/15/2021. A Joint Status Report is due 1/15/2021. Parties' Stipulation is So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/23/2020. (Moon, Chloe)
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #10 Amended Complaint, Extending Defendants' Deadline by CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON (Bongiorno, Michael)
November 30, 2020 ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 12/30/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in Case No. 2:20-cv-05454 (SJF)(ST) indicates that this civil action is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/13/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano for all further proceedings. Judge Ann M Donnelly no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/2/2020. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 Letter re: relatedness by CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON (Bongiorno, Michael)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON, filed by Keith Moulton. (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Letter re: Status Report by Keith Moulton (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/1/2020. (Marino, Janine)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Keith Moulton. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/16/2020. (Marino, Janine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER by Keith Moulton (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keith Moulton. CAREY E. BOND waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; HARVEY J. BAZAAR waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; JANET K. COOPER waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC. waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; MICHAEL FABER waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; DOUGLAS MCCROSSON waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; VINCENT PALAZZOLO waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; WALTER PAULICK waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; ERIC ROSENFELD waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; TERRY STINSON waiver sent on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service _ McCrosson, #2 Waiver of Service - Bazaar, #3 Waiver of Service -Bond, #4 Waiver of Service - Cooper, #5 Waiver of Service - Faber, #6 Waiver of Service - Palazzollo, #7 Waiver of Service - Paulick, #8 Waiver of Service - Rosenfeld, #9 Waiver of Service - Stinson) (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Sica, Michele)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Keith Moulton (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele)
May 8, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. *Certificate of Arbitration Eligibility (Sica, Michele)
May 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Keith Moulton (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAREY E. BOND, HARVEY J. BAZAAR, JANET K. COOPER, CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC., MICHAEL FABER, DOUGLAS MCCROSSON, VINCENT PALAZZOLO, WALTER PAULICK, ERIC ROSENFELD, TERRY STINSON filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12767950 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Keith Moulton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moulton v. MCCROSSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC ROSENFELD
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY STINSON
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVEY J. BAZAAR
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPI AEROSTRUCTURES, INC.
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET K. COOPER
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS MCCROSSON
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL FABER
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREY E. BOND
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT PALAZZOLO
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER PAULICK
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Moulton
Represented By: Benjamin Isaac Sachs-Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?