Lagan v. Edge
Plaintiff: Thomas Lagan
Defendant: Warden Derek Edge
Case Number: 1:2020cv02221
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the emergency petition for a writ for habeas corpus is denied; and that this action is dismissed. Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 6/22/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The emergency petition for a writ for habeas corpus is denied in its entirety. This case is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 6/19/2020. (Greene, Donna)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Letter in Reply to Respondent's Letter in Response (Dkt. No. 7) to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Thomas Lagan (Markham, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Letter in response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #4 and opposing the petition #1 by Derek Edge (Pollack, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to Show Cause,, by Derek Edge. (Pollack, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Marshal Pollack on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to Show Cause. Given that May 25, 2020 is a federal holiday, the government's response is due by May 26, 2020. The petitioner's reply, if any, is due by May 28, 2020. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/20/2020. (Strong, Ardis)
May 19, 2020 Electronic Service upon the U.S. Attorney's Office, re: Petitioner's #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, and Judge Ann M Donnelly's #4 Order to Show Cause issued on 5/19/2020. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The respondent shall Show Cause before this Court why a Writ of Habeas Corpus should not be issued. No later than May 21, 2020, the respondent shall serve and file a return. The petitioner shall file his reply, if any, no later than May 22, 2020. Service of this Order to Show Cause shall be made by the Clerk of this Court by forwarding a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the Petition, to the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of New York. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/19/2020. (Greene, Donna)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Derek Edge. (Sica, Michele)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeking Immediate Release from MDC Brooklyn filing fee $ 5, receipt number ANYEDC-12807237, filed by Thomas Lagan. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Lagan Medical Record, #2 Ex B Affidavit of Jonathan Giftos, MD, #3 Ex C Affidavit of Brie Williams, MD, #4 Ex D Dr. Homer Venters Evaluation Report re MDC, #5 Ex E Excerpts of Stacey Vasquez Deposition, #6 Ex F Dr. Venters Supplemental Report, #7 Ex G Declarations of MDC Inmates, #8 Ex H Intercept Article, May 15, 2020, #9 Ex I AG Barr Memo March 26, 2020, #10 Ex J AG Barr Memo April 3, 2020, #11 Ex K N.D.Ohio Order, #12 Ex L NDNY Order re Lagan, #13 Ex M Declaration of Deirdre Von Dornum, EsquireD, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Proposed Summons) (Markham, John)
May 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagan v. Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Derek Edge
Represented By: Robert Marshal Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lagan
Represented By: John J.E. Markham, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?