Stein v. Serbousek et al
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Defendant: Alexis V. Lukianov, John Sicard, Maria Sainz, James F. Hinrichs, Lilly Marks, Michael E. Paolucci, Ronald A. Matricaria, Orthofix Medical Inc. and Jon C. Serbousek
Case Number: 1:2020cv02233
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 Letter regarding settlement and administrative closure by Shiva Stein (Kupka, Christopher)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Courts approval: Subject to the other provisions of this stipulation, Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses this action with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/29/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah)
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shiva Stein (Melwani, Gloria)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Michele Wuertz on behalf of James F. Hinrichs, Alexis V. Lukianov, Lilly Marks, Ronald A. Matricaria, Orthofix Medical Inc., Michael E. Paolucci, Maria Sainz, Jon C. Serbousek, John Sicard (aty to be noticed) (Wuertz, Allison)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw and strike briefing and argument from the Court's calendar. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/22/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Counsel shall confer and file a submission apprising the Court of how the parties intend to proceed by 5/29/20. Accordingly, the OTSC Hearing previously scheduled for 5/29/20 is adjourned without a date.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/22/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Withdraw #6 Order to Show Cause, and strike briefing and argument from the Court's calendar by Shiva Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proxy Amendment, #2 Proposed Order) (Kupka, Christopher)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Kupka on behalf of Shiva Stein (aty to be noticed) (Kupka, Christopher)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause served on Lyanne Gares on 5/20/2020, filed by Shiva Stein. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Melwani, Gloria)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: A Show Cause Hearing set for 5/29/2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The parties shall dial into the hearing at 1888-684-8852 using access code: 1312089.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/19/2020. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Sica, Michele)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele)
May 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Shiva Stein (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (Melwani, Gloria)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James F. Hinrichs, Alexis V. Lukianov, Lilly Marks, Ronald A. Matricaria, Orthofix Medical Inc., Michael E. Paolucci, Maria Sainz, Jon C. Serbousek, John Sicard filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12809737 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Shiva Stein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Melwani, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Serbousek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis V. Lukianov
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sicard
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Sainz
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Hinrichs
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilly Marks
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Paolucci
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Matricaria
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthofix Medical Inc.
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon C. Serbousek
Represented By: Allison Michele Wuertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Represented By: Gloria Kui Melwani
Represented By: Christopher J. Kupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?