Diomande v. John Doe #1
Plaintiff: Alhoussein Diomande
Defendant: John Doe #1
Case Number: 1:2020cv02256
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Within 30 days of this order, plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit an amended in forma pauperis application that answers each question on the application form. A blank in forma pauperis application form is attached to this order for plaintiffs convenience. Plaintiffs amended application should specify the amount of money that plaintiff now has, including any funds in a checking or savings account. And it should indicate whether plaintiff has access to the proceeds from his 2019 lawsuit. Plaintiff should label any amended in forma pauperis application with docket number 20-CV-2256 (RPK) (LB). This lawsuit will be dismissed without prejudice if plaintiff fails to comply with this order. I certify under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny in forma pauperis status for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 7/8/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03607. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Alhoussein Diomande, 19-A-3690, Franklin Correctional Facility, 62 Bare Hill Road, P.O. Box 10, Malone, NY 12953.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case.The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/12/20) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #4 Order, (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 7, 2020 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #1 by Alhoussein Diomande. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Alhoussein Diomande.(rdz) Modified on 5/12/2020 (rdz). [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe #1. Document filed by Alhoussein Diomande.(rdz) Modified on 5/12/2020 (rdz). [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Alhoussein Diomande.(rdz) Modified on 5/12/2020 (rdz). [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diomande v. John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alhoussein Diomande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?