Tile, Inc. v. Computron Systems International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tile, Inc.
Defendant: Computron Systems International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02297
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit in Support, #3 Proposed Order) (Nickerson, Morgan)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Computron Systems International, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Computron Systems International, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter Requesting Adjournment of Initial Status Conference Due To Defendant's Failure To Appear by Tile, Inc. (Nickerson, Morgan)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #12 Letter Requesting Adjournment. Initial Status Conference scheduled for 7/1/2020 is adjourned sine die, provided that plaintiff shall move for default judgment within 14 days of the Clerk's entry of default. In addition, counsel is advised that since this letter seeks relief from the Court, it should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion". Do not refile the letter. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/26/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request for Certificate of Default by Tile, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Default, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default) (Nickerson, Morgan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/1/2020) (Guzzi, Roseann).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan T. Nickerson on behalf of Tile, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Nickerson, Morgan)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Morgan Nickerson's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/16/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tile, Inc.. Computron Systems International, Inc. served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Nickerson, Morgan)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12845770. by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Nickerson, Morgan)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 7/1/2020 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/21/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Computron Systems International, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tile, Inc. (Chadha, Priya)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Computron Systems International, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12826469 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Computron Systems International, Inc.) (Chadha, Priya)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tile, Inc. v. Computron Systems International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile, Inc.
Represented By: Priya Chadha
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computron Systems International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?