Sasunov v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Boris Sasunov
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Barclays Bank PLC and Bank Of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02449
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Steinlight, Stephen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Steinlight, Stephen)
July 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name to Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP. Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Steinlight, Stephen)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; Barclays Bank PLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 16, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/25/2020. (Walker, Anna)
June 25, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neuner, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays Bank PLC identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank Delaware, Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC for Barclays Bank PLC. (Neuner, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Neuner on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC (aty to be noticed) (Neuner, Jennifer)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 29, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/17/2020. (Walker, Anna)
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boris Sasunov. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Horowitz, Uri)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boris Sasunov. Trans Union, LLC served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Horowitz, Uri)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boris Sasunov. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Horowitz, Uri)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File -- The motion is granted; defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 17, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/16/2020. (Walker, Anna)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Steinlight, Stephen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America NA, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Massand, Shan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Boris Sasunov. U.S. Bank National Association waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Horowitz, Uri)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ginzburg on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (aty to be noticed) (Ginzburg, Daniel)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boris Sasunov. Barclays Bank PLC served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (Horowitz, Uri)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Wells Fargo summos, #2 US Bank summons, #3 BOA summons, #4 Barclay summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Trans Union, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12874260 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Boris Sasunov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Trans Union, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #4 Proposed Summons Bank of America, N.A., #5 Proposed Summons Barclays Bank PLC, #6 Proposed Summons U.S. Bank National Association) (Horowitz, Uri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sasunov v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Stephen Jay Steinlight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Daniel Ginzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Jennifer Neuner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Sasunov
Represented By: Uri Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?