Chalal v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chalal
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Interested Party: Toyota Motor North America and Toyota Motor Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02450
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
2 Judge: William F Kuntz
3 Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. on 7/10/2020, filed by Jennifer Chalal. (Macoretta, John)
July 12, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Toyota Motor North America, Inc. on 7/10/2020, filed by Jennifer Chalal. (Macoretta, John)
July 12, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. on 7/10/2020, filed by Jennifer Chalal. (Macoretta, John)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule regarding Plaintiffs' motion for transfer of actions to the Eastern District of Michigan, 20-CV-629, ECF No. 57 , and Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation, 20-CV-629, ECF No. 61 : 1. The Plaintiffs shall re-serve the motions with any amendments on the Defendants on or before Friday, August 28, 2020; 2.The Defendants shall serve any opposition to Plaintiffs' motions on or before Friday, October 2, 2020; 3.The Plaintiffs shall serve any reply to the Defendants' opposition on or before Friday, October 30, 2020, by 5:00 P.M. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 P.M. on October 30, 2020. Plaintiffs shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Ms. Alexis Love. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/10/2020. (Love, Alexis).
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Zinser on behalf of Jennifer Chalal (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Zinser, Diana)
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Spector on behalf of Jennifer Chalal (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Spector, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Macoretta on behalf of Jennifer Chalal (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Macoretta, John)
July 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/2/2020. (Hazelwood, John)
July 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/2/2020. (Hazelwood, John)
July 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/2/2020. (Hazelwood, John)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12993451. by Jennifer Chalal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service) (Zinser, Diana)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12993440. by Jennifer Chalal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service) (Spector, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12993436. by Jennifer Chalal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service) (Macoretta, John)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 26, 2020 Case Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP, 1:20-cv-02450-WFK-CLP, 1:20-cv-02493-WFK-CLP. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 55 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP, 1:20-cv-02450-WFK-CLP and 1:20-cv-02493-WFK-CLP. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2020 Cases associated. (Love, Alexis)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. by Jennifer Chalal (Corrigan, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. by Jennifer Chalal (Corrigan, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Jennifer Chalal (Corrigan, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Jennifer Chalal (Corrigan, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings. Judge Rachel P. Kovner, Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 6/24/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jennifer Chalal NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION (Corrigan, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: In light of the status report #7 filed by Plaintiff, Plaintiff shall file another status report by 7/16/2020 including the status of completion of service of process and any motion to consolidate. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/16/2020. (Ferrara, Anthony)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Jennifer Chalal (Corrigan, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Corrigan on behalf of Jennifer Chalal (aty to be noticed) (Corrigan, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff filed a complaint in this case on 4/10/2020, and a summons was issued on 4/10/2020. The Plaintiff is directed to provide a status report to the Court by 6/12/2020 indicating whether service has been made on any of the Defendants, and if so, file any proofs of service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/4/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 3, 2020 The case of Chalal v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al, has been transferred from Eastern District of Pennsylvania to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv2450. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01867. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.&1404 (a). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/2/20. 6/2/20 ENTERED NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/3/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer PLAINTIFFS CONSENTED-TO MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK filed by JENNIFER CHALAL.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MACORETTA, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/3/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC.. E-mailed To: JOHN A. MACORETTA, ESQ. on 4/10/2020 (dmc, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/3/2020.]
April 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JENNIFER CHALAL. (fb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/3/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14230842.), filed by JENNIFER CHALAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track Form)(MACORETTA, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chalal v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Toyota Motor North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Toyota Motor Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chalal
Represented By: John A. Macoretta
Represented By: Diana Zinser
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Corrigan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: John A Macoretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?