Mirza et al v. Amar
Plaintiff: Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC and Dr. Muhammad Mirza
Defendant: Alia Salman Amar
Case Number: 1:2020cv02699
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 . Telephone conference adjourned to 8/27/2020 at 10:00 am. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the initial status conference set forth at #4 and are further directed to file on ECF a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/28/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza. (Lin, David)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alia Salman Amar. (Guzzi, Roseann)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza (Lin, David)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 7/30/2020 at 1:00 pm and will be held by telephone. Parties are directed to use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/18/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) Modified on 7/22/2020 (Weisberg, Peggy).
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alia Salman Amar filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-12942074 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Muhammad Mirza, Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirza et al v. Amar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alia Salman Amar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC
Represented By: David D. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Muhammad Mirza
Represented By: David D. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?