Rehaman v. Liberty Maritime Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Subeeh U. Rehaman
Defendant: Liberty Grace Corporation and Liberty Maritime Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02823
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Subeeh U. Rehaman. Liberty Grace Corporation served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Hofmann, Paul)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Liberty Grace summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Subeeh U. Rehaman (Hofmann, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Subeeh U. Rehaman (Hofmann, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Subeeh U. Rehaman (Hofmann, Paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Grace Corporation, Liberty Maritime Corporation filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12977608 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Subeeh U. Rehaman. (Hofmann, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehaman v. Liberty Maritime Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subeeh U. Rehaman
Represented By: Paul T. Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Grace Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Maritime Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?