Rivers v. Edge
Petitioner: Kassin J. Rivers
Respondent: Warden D. Edge
Case Number: 1:2020cv02968
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the petition is denied for the reasons set for in this Courts April 28, 2020 decision denying Petitioners motion for immediate release under the CARES Act. 18-CR-192-3, ECF No. 95; and that the petition is dismissed. Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 8/14/2020. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: On July 1, 2020, Kassin Rivers ("Petitioner"), appearing pro se, filed this petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 seeking relief under the CARES Act. ECF No. #1 . The petition is DENIED for the reasons set for in this Court's April 28, 2020 decision denying Petitioner's motion for immediate release under the CARES Act. 18-CR-192-3, ECF No. 95 . The instant action raises no additional facts or arguments for relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Further, no useful purpose would be served by the litigation of this duplicative motion. Curtis v. Citibank, N.A., 226 F.3d 133, 138 (2d Cir. 2000) ("As part of its general power to administer its docket, a district court may stay or dismiss a suit that is duplicative of another federal court suit."). Accordingly, the petition is dismissed. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/12/2020. (Love, Alexis)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 4653150844 by Kassin Rivers. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II for all further proceedings (as related to 18-cr-192). Judge Pamela K. Chen no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 7/10/2020. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. Mailed out 7/6/2020 (Davis, Kimberly)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Kassin J. Rivers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kassin J. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden D. Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?