Lodge v. Barr
Petitioner: Robert Lodge
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv02970
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER: Case transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. So Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 8/12/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah)
August 12, 2020 CASE: 1:20-cv-02970 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Middle District of Georgia as case 4:20-cv-00189, filed 08/12/2020. (Marziliano, August)
August 12, 2020 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Middle District of Georgia as case 4:20-cv-00189, filed 08/12/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 7/6/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Robert Lodge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodge v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?