Lodge v. Barr
Petitioner: Robert Lodge
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv02971
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 CASE: 1:20-cv-02971 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Georgia as case 2:20-cv-00164, filed 07/15/2020. (Marziliano, August)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Case transferred to the Northern District of Georgia. File, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM ECF Civil Extract. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/14/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Robert Lodge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodge v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?